skip to content

Glicksman, Amy Sara

CPSO#: 97714

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitati
150 Kilgour Rd
East York ON  M4G 1R8 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 3G7
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY SARA GLICKSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLICKSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 24 Feb 2019 to 28 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2019 to 15 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 16 Jun 2019 to 22 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019