skip to content

Gleicher, Yehoshua

CPSO#: 95702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital, Anesthesia
Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5270
Fax: 416-586-8664 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yehoshua Gleicher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gleicher ( CPSO# 95702 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YEHOSHUA GLEICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEICHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016