skip to content

Glaude, Pier Diane

CPSO#: 97509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Paediatric Associates
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-3766
Fax: (705) 728-3757 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pier Diane Glaude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glaude ( CPSO# 97509 )

Business Address:
Barrie Paediatric Associates
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PIER DIANE GLAUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAUDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Jun 2012 to 07 Jul 2012
EL - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2014 to 06 Mar 2014
EL - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015