skip to content

Glassman, Steven Jeremy

CPSO#: 87346

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Feb 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dermatology Clinic
4th Floor Civic Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 761-4689
Fax: (613) 761-4087 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
75 Bruyere Street
Photoderm Clinic, 2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6354
Fax: (613) 562-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Steven J. Glassman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Glassman ( CPSO# 87346 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room 13 Main Floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4689

Business Address:
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
75 Bruyere Street
Photoderm Clinic, 2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6354


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:05 Feb 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active
             Dr. Steven Jeremy Glassman may practise medicine independently in dermatology.