skip to content

Gladwell, Heather Elizabeth

CPSO#: 90480

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Baerg, Heather Elizabeth (used until: 12 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Emergency Medicine
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

SOAHAC
733 9th Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 3E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-5508
Fax: (519) 376-1845
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Canada
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4079
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gladwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gladwell ( CPSO# 90480 )
Dr. M. Gladwell ( CPSO# 90498 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1
Phone Number: (519) 376-1631

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
2000-1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
3-733 9th Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 3E6
Phone Number: (519) 376-5508

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH GLADWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011