skip to content

Giuliani, Meredith Elana

CPSO#: 87141

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Cntr
Radiatioon Medicine Program
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6513
Fax: (416) 946-6566 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meredith Giuliani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Giuliani ( CPSO# 87141 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEREDITH ELANA GIULIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIULIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 18 Sep 2007
AVP - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012