skip to content

Girvan, David Pugsley

CPSO#: 20940

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jan 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Girvan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014