skip to content

Giroux, Stephanie Anne

CPSO#: 91075

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2120 Regent Street
Unit 5
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 222-3737 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. A. Giroux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Giroux ( CPSO# 91075 )

Business Address:
2120 Regent Street
Unit 5
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 222-3737

Business Address:
1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 222-9038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE GIROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIROUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012