skip to content

Girlan, Larisa Mirela

CPSO#: 85007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
64 Cameron Street East, P.O. Box 69
Cannington ON  L0E 1E0
Phone: 705-432-3388 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Larisa Girlan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 28 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LARISA MIRELA GIRLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008