skip to content

Girgis, Ireen Makram Aziz

CPSO#: 85653

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON  L7A 0N5
Phone: (905) 840-4343
Fax: (905) 840-4303 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

305 Royal west drive
unit K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 452-0200
Fax: (905) 452-0212
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

423 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON  L7A 0N9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ireen Girgis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Girgis ( CPSO# 85653 )

Business Address:
305 Royalwest Drive
Suite K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IREEN MAKRAM AZIZ GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)