skip to content

Girgis, Ireen Makram Aziz

CPSO#: 85653

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON  L7A 0N5
Phone: (905) 840-4343
Fax: (905) 840-4303 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

305 Royal west drive
unit K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 452-0200
Fax: (905) 452-0212
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

423 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON  L7A 0N9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ireen Girgis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Girgis ( CPSO# 85653 )

Business Address:
305 Royalwest Drive
Suite K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 Dec 2019 Active
             As from December 8, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ireen Makram Aziz
            Girgis in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Girgis to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. IREEN MAKRAM AZIZ GIRGIS
                                          ("Dr. Girgis")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Girgis, certificate of registration number 85653, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215310 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        a minimum of six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a
                              minimum of three (3) months;
                  
                        (iv)  After a minimum of three (3) months of Clinical Supervision,
                              if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves
                              a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical
                              Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or
                              another location approved by the College, once every month
                              for a further three (3) months;
                  
                        (v)   Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for three (3) months, until the first level of
                              supervision has ended, then once at the end of supervision,
                              or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor
                        dated July 23, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The University of Toronto's Medical Record-Keeping Course; 
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the
                              following CPSO policies:
                  
                              1.    Medical Records; 
                  
                              2.    Transitions in Care; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to complete this requirement within four
                        (4) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review, interview with me, direct observation of my care,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Girgis, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Girgis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Girgis
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              her family medicine practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Girgis will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6
                                    months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Girgis will engage in professional education,
                                    including in medical record-keeping.
                  
                                    Dr. Girgis's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the end of
                                    the clinical supervision and professional education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Girgis, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Girgis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Girgis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Girgis, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ireen Makram Aziz Girgis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 8, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Girgis engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Girgis will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Girgis will engage in professional education, including in medical record-keeping.

Dr. Girgis’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the clinical supervision and professional education.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)