skip to content

Girdhari, Rajesh Philip

CPSO#: 93004

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sumac Creek Health Centre
St Michael's Hospital FHT
Third Floor
73 Regent Park Blvd
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: 416-864-3022
Fax: 416-864-6051 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Regen Medical Clinic
Suite 103
5359 Dundas Ave West
Toronto ON  M9B 1B1
Canada
Phone: 416-233-4444
Fax: 855-779-7978
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJESH PHILIP GIRDHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRDHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012