skip to content

Girardi, Brandon Larry

CPSO#: 95382

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MSK Centre
115-675 Queen St South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: 519-603-0605
Fax: 519-603-0606 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. B. Girardi & K. Komsa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Girardi ( CPSO# 95382 )
Dr. K. Komsa ( CPSO# 106924)

Business Address:
MSK Centre
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Business Address:
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Mississauga ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANDON LARRY GIRARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRARDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017