skip to content

Giordani, Christine Elizabeth Jennissen

CPSO#: 97683

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Acton, Christine Elizabeth Jennissen (used until: 28 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pain Care Clinics
300 Fourth Avenue Unit D
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Phone: 365-653-7246
Fax: 365-653-7247 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Greater Niagara General Hospital
Emergency Department
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christine Giordani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Giordani ( CPSO# 97683 )

Business Address:
D - 300 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Phone Number: (365) 653-7246

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ELIZABETH JENNISSEN GIORDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIORDANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014