skip to content

Ginsberg, Jeffrey Stephen

CPSO#: 31086

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 church street
Oakville ON  L6J 1N4
Phone: 905 520 0709
Fax: 905 8425221 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Ginsberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ginsberg ( CPSO# 31086 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEPHEN GINSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979