skip to content

Ginsberg, Gregory Gerard

CPSO#: 87786

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Nov 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2019