skip to content

Ginn, Jeffery Lloyd

CPSO#: 86080

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Priestman Street
Fredericton NB  E3B 5N5
Phone: 506-452-5400

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeffery Ginn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ginn ( CPSO# 86080 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4242

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
700 Priestman Street
Fredericton NB  E3B 5N5
Phone Number: (506) 452-5400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFERY LLOYD GINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2007