skip to content

Gilman, Michael Louis

CPSO#: 24747

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 29 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Gilman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent S North York ON M3J 1Y6
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact RSRS by Tel: 1-888-563-3732, or by fax: 1-416-398-5932.
Date Received: 04 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 2020