skip to content

Gillies, Mary-Melinda Louise

CPSO#: 85255

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary-Melinda Gillies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 Mar 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011