skip to content

Gillies, Alison Ruth

CPSO#: 98159

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Queen West CHC
1229 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6K 1L2
Phone: 416-537-2455
Fax: 416-537-3526 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON RUTH GILLIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 13 Jan 2015 to 14 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015