skip to content

Gill, Vikramjit Singh

CPSO#: 97078

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vikramjit Singh Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 13 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015