skip to content

Gill, Sandeep Kaur

CPSO#: 93067

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
231 OakPark Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandeep Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gill ( CPSO# 93067 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
231 OakPark Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone Number: (905) 901-5111

Business Address:
314-1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 842-8383

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDEEP KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012