skip to content

Gill, Russell Alexander

CPSO#: 13297

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 18-Jul-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1955 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1950
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2004