skip to content

Gill, Roopan Kaur

CPSO#: 96267

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:21 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROOPAN KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020