skip to content

Gill, Rajanjot Kaur

CPSO#: 89240

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Kalsi, Rajanjot Kaur (used until: 26 Feb 2014 )     Gill, Rajanjot Kaur (used until: 23 Jun 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Services
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: 613-440-3238 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department Of Rheumatology
6th Floor, Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H7W9
Canada
Phone: 613-738-8400 Ext. 81850
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
Ambulatory Care Unit
566 Louise Street
Winchester
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: 613-774-2420 Ext. 6318
Fax: 613-774-7206
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

713 Montreal Rd
Canadian Forces Health Services Cen
Specialty Clinic, 5th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 6139451550
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: RAJANJOT GILL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gill ( CPSO# 89240 )

Business Address:
43 Fairlop Way
Nepean ON  K2J 5B8
Phone Number: 613-315-5276

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJANJOT KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014