Gill, Parwinder Kaur (CPSO#: 94043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Edward St
Unit 920
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: 647 352 2554
Fax: 8668817790
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Advanced Medical Group
230 Victoria St
London ON  L4Z 0B9
Canada
Phone: 5198731700
Fax: 5198731717
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Dawson Family Medical Centre
83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON  N1H1B1
Canada
Phone: 5197661360
Fax: 5197660469
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 03 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARWINDER KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014