skip to content

Gill, Mandeep Singh

CPSO#: 95527

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8L4
Phone: (519) 624-9641
Fax: (519) 260 0939 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mandeep Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gill ( CPSO# 95527 )

Business Address:
1 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8L4
Phone Number: (519) 624-9641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANDEEP SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016