skip to content

Gill, Harmander Singh

CPSO#: 88802

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
13 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact: The 6ix Medical Clinics 57-550 Front St W Toronto ON M5V 3N5 Fax: 647-695-3699
Date Received: 29 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 May 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Apr 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Aug 2021
Summary:

COURT FILE NO.  
                                      ONTARIO 
                           SUPERIOR COURT OF JUSTICE 
                                (DIVISIONAL COURT) 
                                           
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE DIVISIONAL COURT 
                                           

BETWEEN: 

                            DR. HARMANDER SINGH GILL 

                                                                            Appellant 

                                         And 

                                           

               COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO 

                                                                          Respondent 

                                           

                         __________________________________ 

                                 NOTICE OF APPEAL 

                         __________________________________ 

                                           

       
THE APPELLANT, Dr. Harmander Gill, APPEALS to the Divisional Court from; 
 
   (1) the decision of the Discipline Panel of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, to 
      proceed with a disciplinary hearing in his absence, dated April 1, 2019 at Toronto; and 
   (2) the decision of Dr. Clapperton of The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario denying the 
      Appellant’s request for an adjournment of the hearing dates, reasons dated April 4, 2019 at 
      Toronto; and, 
   (3) the decision of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
      finding that the Appellant committed an act of professional misconduct and that he is 
      incompetent dated April 16, 2019 with reasons released on February 25, 2020 made at Toronto; 
      and, 
   (4) the decision of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
      suspending the Appellant’s certificate of registration on May 21, 2019 as a term of granting an 
      adjournment of the motion to re-open the hearing; 
   (5) the rulings of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to 
      curtail answers in cross examination and re-examination during the motion to re-open and not 
      permitting the Appellant to adduce additional evidence on the motion to re-open; 
   (6) the decision of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
      denying the Appellant’s request to re-open the hearing that had been conducted in his absence 
      and denying his request to adjourn the motion to re-open and to call additional evidence on the 
      motion, dated December 18, 2019 made at Toronto; and  
   (7) from the penalty decision of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
      of Ontario, revoking the Appellant’s license, dated April 13, 2021 made at Toronto.   

       

THE APPELLANT ASKS that the judgments be set aside and a judgment be granted as follows:   

   1. An Order quashing the decision of the Discipline Panel made against the Appellant, and 
      ordering a new hearing into the allegations against the Appellant; or in the alternative, 

   2. An Order requiring the Discipline Panel to re-open the hearing and to reconsider its decision 
      after having heard the Appellant’s defence; or in the alternative,  

   3. An Order overturning the penalty decision of the Discipline Panel made against the Appellant on 
      April 13, 2021 and substituting an appropriate penalty in the circumstances; and 

   4. An Order quashing the decision as to Costs ordered by the Discipline Panel; and  

   5. Such further and other relief as this Honourable Court may deem just.  

       

THE GROUNDS OF APPEAL are as follows:   

   1. That Dr. Clapperton erred in her decision denying the Appellant’s adjournment request on 
      March 29, 2019, with reasons dated April 4, 2019; 

   2. That the Discipline Panel erred in proceeding with the hearing dates in April 2019 in the 
      absence of the Appellant who was at the time a self represented litigant and in hospital and that 
      their reasons in this regard were insufficient; 

   3. That counsel for the College did not act fairly in adducing evidence on April 1, 2019 which was 
      unreliable and misleading to the panel of the Discipline Committee; 
   4. That the Discipline Panel erred in denying counsel for the Appellant’s request to additional 
      evidence on the motion in the form of an affidavit and further by limiting the Appellant’s viva 
      voce evidence on the motion; 

   5. That the conduct of counsel for the College during the motion to re-open was improper in a 
      number of respects and rendered the proceedings against the Appellant unfair;  

   6. That the Discipline Panel erred in denying the Appellant’s motion to re-open the discipline 
      hearing to permit him to advance a defence despite the fact that the Appellant had been at the 
      hospital repeatedly and underwent numerous assessments and tests prior to, during and 
      following the dates scheduled for the hearing; 

   7. That the Discipline Panel erred in making findings against the Appellant at the hearing proper 
      without the benefit of input from the Appellant or any defence evidence; 

   8. That the Discipline Panel erred in revoking Appellant’s certificate of registration on the basis of 
      findings made based on evidence presented solely by the College and untested by the Appellant. 

       

THE BASIS OF THE APPELLATE COURT’S JURISDICTION IS:   

   (i) s. 70(1) and (2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health 
         Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 and Section 61 of the Rules of Civil Procedure 

   (ii) The Order appealed from is final, 

   (iii) Leave to appeal is not required.  

 

      The appellant requests that this appeal be heard at the Divisional Court in Toronto. 

      TAKE NOTICE: THIS APPEAL WILL AUTOMATICALLY BE DISMISSED if it has not been 
set down for hearing or terminated by any means within five years after the notice of appeal was filed 
with the court, unless otherwise ordered by the court. 

       
August 14, 2021                                 Margaret Bojanowska 
                                                BARRISTER & SOLICITOR 
                                                180 Bloor Street West, Suite 1201 
                                                Toronto, ON M5S 2V6 
 
                                                Tel. (647) 272-5503 
                                                Fax. (416) 934-0006 
                                                E-mail: [email protected] 
                                                 

                                                 

TO    Ruth Ainsworth 

      COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO 

      80 College Street, Toronto, ON M5G 2E2 

      Prosecutor for the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 

 

 
                                                          RCP-E 61A.1 (February 1, 2021)


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 25 & 26, 2021

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2019
Summary:

On April 16, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gill has committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that:  he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee also found that Dr. 
Gill is incompetent. The Committee released its reasons on February 25, 2020. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Gill failed to maintain the standard of practice in that his records 
were unreliable as a reflection of the nature and details of patient encounters and patients’ 
overall health status, and they were wholly inadequate to the provision of good quality patient 
care. Moreover, Dr. Gill’s care of patients with common, sometimes serious acute and chronic 
conditions was poor. He also failed to meet the standard of practice in that he did not 
adequately assess, monitor, and document those conditions, did not respond to important 
information in patient records from other sources, and exposed his patients to the risk of 
significant harm and injury.  
 
The Committee found that Dr. Gill engaged in conduct or an act or omission that would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional tin that 
Dr. Gill submitted thousands of claims to OHIP for rapid strep tests that he did not perform. As 
well, of any rapid strep tests he may have conducted, many or all were without justification. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Gill is incompetent in that his professional care of patients 
displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates 
that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be restricted.  
 
On December 14, 2020, the Committee heard submissions from both parties on penalty and 
costs.  
 
On April 13, 2021, the Discipline Committee released its penalty and costs decision, in which it 
directed and ordered: 
          •  Dr. Gill to attend before the panel to be reprimanded 
          •  the Registrar to revoke Dr. Gill’s certificate of registration effective immediately 
          •  Dr. Gill to pay costs to the College in the amount of $124,440 within 30 days of the 
             date of the Order. 
 
Appeal 

On May 12, 2021, the College received Dr. Gill’s notice of appeal to the Superior Court of 
Justice (Divisional Court) from the decisions of the Discipline Committee with respect to 
procedural rulings, finding, penalty and costs.  

On August 14, 2021 the College received a revised notice of appeal adding new grounds of 
appeal concerning the April 2019 hearing and the refusal of Dr. Gill’s request to re-open the 
hearing and adduce new evidence.  

Pursuant to section 71 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the 
Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, an order made by a panel of the 
Discipline Committee on the grounds of incompetence directing the Registrar to revoke a 
member’s certificate of registration takes effect immediately, despite any appeal.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: Apr 1-2, 4-5, 8, 2019 Adjournment Motion: May 21, 2019 Motion to Re-Open Hearing: July 2, 3, and 5, 2019 Motion to Vary a Discipline Order: May 24, 2019 Penalty Hearing: December 14, 2020