skip to content

Gill, Harmander Singh

CPSO#: 88802

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
13 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact: The 6ix Medical Clinics 57-550 Front St W Toronto ON M5V 3N5 Fax: 647-695-3699
Date Received: 29 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 May 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Apr 2021

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Gill’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Gill engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in failing to cooperate with a College investigation, from approximately April 2018 onwards, including by failing to cooperate with respect to observation of his practice and a requested interview; and failing to respond to inquiries from a College investigator, and to provide answers to questions from the investigator.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): May 25 & 26, 2021

Hearing Status: Decision Under Reserve

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2019
Summary:

On April 16, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gill has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that:  he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
the profession; and he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee 
 also found that Dr. Gill is incompetent. The Committee released its reasons on February 
 25, 2020. 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Gill failed to maintain the standard of practice in that his 
records were unreliable as a reflection of the nature and details of patient encounters 
and patients’ overall health status, and they were wholly inadequate to the provision of 
good quality patient care. Moreover, Dr. Gill’s care of patients with common, sometimes 
serious acute and chronic conditions was poor. He also failed to meet the standard of 
 practice in that he did not adequately assess, monitor, and document those conditions, 
 did not respond to important information in patient records from other sources, and 
 exposed his patients to the risk of significant harm and injury.  
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Gill engaged in conduct or an act or omission that would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional tin 
 that Dr. Gill submitted thousands of claims to OHIP for rapid strep tests that he did not 
 perform. As well, of any rapid strep tests he may have conducted, many or all were 
 without justification. 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Gill is incompetent in that his professional care of 
 patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment of a nature or to an extent that 
 demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be 
 restricted.  
  
 On December 14, 2020, the Committee heard submissions from both parties on penalty 
 and costs.  
  
 On April 13, 2021, the Discipline Committee released its penalty and costs decision, in 
 which it directed and ordered: 
          •  Dr. Gill to attend before the panel to be reprimanded 
          •  the Registrar to revoke Dr. Gill’s certificate of registration effective immediately 
          •  Dr. Gill to pay costs to the College in the amount of $124,440 within 30 days of the 
             date of the Order. 
  
 Appeal 

 On May 12, 2021, the College received Dr. Gill’s notice of appeal to the Superior Court of Justice 
(Divisional Court) from the decisions of the Discipline Committee with respect to finding and to 
penalty. Pursuant to section 71 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, an order made by a panel of the 
Discipline Committee on the grounds of incompetence directing the Registrar to revoke a 
member’s certificate of registration takes effect immediately, despite any appeal.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: Apr 1-2, 4-5, 8, 2019 Adjournment Motion: May 21, 2019 Motion to Re-Open Hearing: July 2, 3, and 5, 2019 Motion to Vary a Discipline Order: May 24, 2019 Penalty Hearing: December 14, 2020