skip to content

Gill, Aneeqa Anwar

CPSO#: 86529

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-1144 WILSON STREET WEST
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: (289) 239-7717
Fax: 2892399219 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Anwar Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gill ( CPSO# 86529 )

Business Address:
202-1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (289) 239-7717

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANEEQA ANWAR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2010