skip to content

Gilday, David Lorne

CPSO#: 22747

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Date of Death: 7-Mar-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016