skip to content

Gilbert, Rosemarie Grace

CPSO#: 29689

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.