skip to content

Gilbert, Jaclyn Christina

CPSO#: 95131

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
C6001, 6th Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 2321
Fax: 416-469-7660 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jaclyn Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gilbert ( CPSO# 95131 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Ave
Department of Anesthesia
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: 416-469-6580

Business Address:
Room C6001
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
Room D-149
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACLYN CHRISTINA GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016