Giilck, Stephen Murray (CPSO#: 98721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen M. Giilck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Giilck ( CPSO# 98721 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MURRAY GIILCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIILCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016