skip to content

Giffin, Meredith Vanessa

CPSO#: 90961

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208-89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B9
Phone: 519-265-7477
Fax: 519-265-6006 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 113
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
Phone: 226-647-8020
Fax: 519-488-0632
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Giffin ( CPSO# 90961 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
208-89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B9
Phone Number: (519) 265-7472

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEREDITH VANESSA GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 11 Nov 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 07 Apr 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2015