skip to content

Gidwani, Ram Nanikram

CPSO#: 23980

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.N. Gidwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2021
Corporation Name: A.S. Jose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020