skip to content

Gibson, Brian Louis

CPSO#: 27498

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LAMP Occupational Health Centre
185 Fifth Street
Etobicoke ON  M8V 2Z5
Phone: (416) 252-9701 Ext. 272
Fax: (416) 252-5100 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: LAMP Occupational Health Centre 185 Fifth Street Etobicoke, ON M8V2Z5
Date Received: 01 May 2020


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact LAMP Occupational Health Centre at: 185 Fifth Street, Etobicoke, ON, M8V 2Z5.
Date Received: 05 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN LOUIS GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1975