skip to content

Gibney, Patrick Francis

CPSO#: 29666

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 357-6636
Fax: (905) 357-5592 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Gibney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gibney ( CPSO# 29666 )

Business Address:
306 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 357-6636


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICK FRANCIS GIBNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1977