skip to content

Gibbons Gomez, Paul

CPSO#: 94483

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Gibbons Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cardinal Cartier ( CPSO# 93982 )
Dr. P. Gibbons Gomez ( CPSO# 94483 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 04 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 04 Feb 2020 Active
             As from February 4, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Gibbons Gomez
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gibbons Gomez to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                 of
                  
                                    DR. PAUL GIBBONS GOMEZ
                                          ("Dr. Gomez")
                  
                                                to

                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, certificate of registration number 94483, am a
                  member of the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that the College conducted a
                  reassessment of my emergency medicine practice which raised concerns
                  about my standard of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        at least six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a
                              minimum of three (3) months;
                  
                        (iv)  After a minimum of three (3) months of Clinical Supervision,
                              if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves
                              a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical
                              Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or
                              another location approved by the College, once every month
                              for a further three (3) months;
                  
                        (v)   Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for three (3) months or until the College approves a
                              reduction in the level of supervision, and then once at the
                              end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor,
                        received May 5, 2019 and letter from the assessor dated July 17,
                        2019 and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake to cooperate fully with the
                        Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of
                        this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide
                        by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (6) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the
                        College.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location at which I practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any
                        Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
                        Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and
                        NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix
                        "D", respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College reassessment was conducted of Dr. GibbonsGomez's
                              emergency medicine practice. As a result of the reassessment:
                  
                                    Dr. Gibbons Gomez will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a
                                    minimum of six (6) months.
                  
                                    Dr. Gibbons Gomez's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                                    of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:
                  
                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, mypractice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led
                  to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Gibbons Gomez, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment; and/or
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Gibbons Gomez to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2020:

A College reassessment was conducted of Dr. Gibbons Gomez’s emergency medicine practice. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Gibbons Gomez will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of six (6) months.

Dr. Gibbons Gomez’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: December 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On December 8, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required emergency medicine physician, Dr. Paul Gibbons Gomez, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Gibbons Gomez to:

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

• Provide a written summary of each of the following policies with reference to how it is applicable to emergency medicine:

oCPSO Medical Records policy #4-12;
o CPSO Confidentiality of Patient Health Information policy #8-05;

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately six months following the completion of the education program.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 16, 2020, Dr. Gibbons Gomez has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)