skip to content

Giacomantonio, Angela Lorraine

CPSO#: 100577

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018