skip to content

Ghuman, Harleen Kaur

CPSO#: 93525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Christian Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 306, 99 Northfield Dr. East
Waterloo ON  N2K 3P6
Phone: 519-279-1497
Fax: 519-279-9642 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Wellness Centre
Wilfred Laurier University
75 University Ave. West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Canada
Phone: 519-884-0710 Ext. 3146
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

301-450 Frederick St
Phoenix Healthcare Centre
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P5
Canada
Phone: 519-748-6933
Fax: 519-748-9733
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rahil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rahil ( CPSO# 84812 )
Dr. H. Ghuman ( CPSO# 93525 )

Business Address:
Phoenix Healthcare Centre
301-450 Frederick St
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 748-6933

Business Address:
306 - 99 Northfield Dr E
Waterloo ON  N2K 3P9
Phone Number: 519-279-1497

Business Address:
211-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: 519-780-0375

Business Address:
Student Wellness Centre
Wilfred Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-0710


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARLEEN KAUR GHUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012