skip to content

Ghoul, Suha Marwan Musa

CPSO#: 94288

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 05 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 28 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2014