Ghotra, Harpreet Singh (CPSO#: 99338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Aug 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Government Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone: (416) 264-4848
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Morningside Medical Centre
Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Markham Kingston Medical Centre
3345 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harpreet Ghotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghotra ( CPSO# 99338 )

Business Address:
Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Business Address:
Kingston Morningside Medical Centre
204 - 4500 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N9
Phone Number: (416) 287-3100

Business Address:
Markham Kingston Medical Centre
18 - 3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 266-6600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Harpreet Singh Ghotra may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.