skip to content

Ghosh, Ananda

CPSO#: 90549

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 416
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-5346
Fax: (905) 849-6551 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ananda Ghosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Patriquin ( CPSO# 89380 )
Dr. A. Ghosh ( CPSO# 90549 )

Business Address:
416 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 844-5346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANANDA GHOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013