skip to content

Ghoche, Roger

CPSO#: 86199

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital MCL 8-433 399 Bathurst Street Toronto, ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 17 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2014