skip to content

Ghobrial, Mahassen Malak

CPSO#: 23808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mahassen Ghobrial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghobrial ( CPSO# 23808 )
Dr. D. Saleh ( CPSO# 79460 )

Business Address:
314 Central Park Drive
Ottawa ON  K2C 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 728-0608

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Records Management Limited at: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 09 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHASSEN MALAK GHOBRIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOBRIAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971