skip to content

Ghazavi, Mohammad Taghi

CPSO#: 67809

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Medical Center
Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael Hospital
30 Bond St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-360-4000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Elite Medical Center Unit 16 & 17
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6P8
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-9090
Fax: (289) 597-9090
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 4168547077
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TAGHI GHAZAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 14 Mar 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2008