skip to content

Gharib, Mireille Tina

CPSO#: 95819

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric
Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIREILLE TINA GHARIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHARIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2016