skip to content

Ghaffari, Seyed Reza

CPSO#: 85913

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Farsi, German

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
90 Glenn Allan
Bridgewater NS  B4V3S6
Phone: 9025275215

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:06 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEYED REZA GHAFFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 26 Apr 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2018