skip to content

Ghaffar, Abdul

CPSO#: 21705

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Karachi, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Great Lakes Medical Centre 25 Great Lakes Drive Brampton ON L6R 2S5
Date Received: 01 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Abdul Ghaffar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 2, 2018:

Dr. Ghaffar was the subject of a College investigation into his practice. During the investigation, Dr. Ghaffar resigned his certificate of registration, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)